US HB789 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Medicare prescription drug plan sponsors from retroactively reducing payment on clean claims submitted by pharmacies. (A "clean claim" is a Medicare claim that is free of defects such as incomplete documentation.)
Title
Improving Transparency and Accuracy in Medicare Part D Spending Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB803 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB988 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB988 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/789/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr789/BILLS-116hr789ih.pdf |