US HB7856 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 11 - 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 11 - 8.
2020-07-31HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-07-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
2020-07-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6624 (Related) 2020-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB7225 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Afghanistan
Air quality
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Armenia
Arms control and nonproliferation
Art, artists, authorship
Asia
Aviation and airports
Azerbaijan
Buy American requirements
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
China
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coast guard
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Detention of persons
Director of National Intelligence
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Economic performance and conditions
Education programs funding
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hate crimes
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Homeland security
Hong Kong
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Marine and inland water transportation
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military civil functions
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Militias and paramilitary groups
Minority education
Minority employment
National Security Agency
News media and reporting
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
Pacific Ocean
Policy sciences
Political movements and philosophies
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Public participation and lobbying
Public-private cooperation
Qatar
Racial and ethnic relations
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Right of privacy
Russia
Saudi Arabia
Science and engineering education
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Spacecraft and satellites
Student aid and college costs
Subversive activities
Telephone and wireless communication
Terrorism
Trade agreements and negotiations
United Arab Emirates
Violent crime
War and emergency powers
Women's rights
Worker safety and health
World health
Yemen

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback