US HB7795 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans Benefits Fairness and Transparency Act of 2020 This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to publish on its website the disability benefit questionnaire forms for non-VA medical providers submitting evidence regarding a disability of a claimant for purposes of VA benefits. If the VA updates the questionnaire form, previous versions of the form filed by claimants must be accepted for up to one year after the form was updated. The VA may waive interagency approval processes required to approve a modification to a form if such requirement applies by reason of the form being made public on the website as required by the bill. The Inspector General of the VA must, through 2026, annually report on the use of such forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Benefits Fairness and Transparency Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2020-09-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4685)
2020-09-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7795.
2020-09-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4685-4687)
2020-09-22HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-09-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2020-07-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-07-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-07-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2020-07-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB4412 (Same As) 2020-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback