US HB7789 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to establish a working group relating to best practices and Federal guidance for animals in emergencies and disasters, and for other purposes.
Title
PAW Act Planning for Animal Wellness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442. |
2022-12-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-611. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2022-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4205 (Same As) 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-212.
HR1339 (Similar To) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1339 (Similar To) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.