US HB7778 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 348.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 348.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to prohibit misuse of the Department of Homeland Security seal, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Seal Protection Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 348. |
2022-07-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-446. |
2022-05-19 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged. |
2022-05-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-05-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2022-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |