US HB7707 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To codify in statute the CDC title 42 expulsion order, which suspends the right for certain aliens to enter the United States along United States land borders, until February 1, 2025.
Title
The Spc. Bishop E. Evans Border Security Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4022 (Related) 2022-04-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7707/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7707/BILLS-117hr7707ih.pdf |