US HB7703 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the allocation of certain funds for purposes related to the Caribbean Basin Security Initiative, requires the Department of State to develop a strategy for prioritizing efforts to increase disaster response and resilience in the Caribbean, and establishes monitoring and reporting requirements. Funds for carrying out the initiative shall be used for purposes that include (1) promoting citizen safety, security, and the rule of law in the Caribbean; (2) prioritizing efforts to combat corruption; and (3) promoting the rule of law in the Caribbean and countering influence from authoritarian regimes. The State Department shall develop a strategy that incorporates specific, measurable benchmarks demonstrating a prioritization of efforts to increase disaster response and resilience through carrying out specified coordination, resilience, and preparedness programs in beneficiary countries. The State Department must also submit an implementation plan that includes a timeline and stated objectives for such actions to be taken.
Title
Caribbean Basin Security Initiative Authorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5900-5901) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7703. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5900-5902) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Espaillat moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-07-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Antigua and Barbuda
Asia
Bahamas
Barbados
Border security and unlawful immigration
Caribbean area
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disaster relief and insurance
Dominica
Dominican Republic
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Firearms and explosives
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Grenada
Guyana
Human rights
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Jamaica
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Natural disasters
News media and reporting
Organized crime
Performance measurement
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Saint Kitts and Nevis
Saint Lucia
Saint Vincent and the Grenadines
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Suriname
Telephone and wireless communication
Trinidad and Tobago
U.S. and foreign investments
Asia
Bahamas
Barbados
Border security and unlawful immigration
Caribbean area
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disaster relief and insurance
Dominica
Dominican Republic
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Firearms and explosives
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Grenada
Guyana
Human rights
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Jamaica
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Natural disasters
News media and reporting
Organized crime
Performance measurement
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Saint Kitts and Nevis
Saint Lucia
Saint Vincent and the Grenadines
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Suriname
Telephone and wireless communication
Trinidad and Tobago
U.S. and foreign investments