US HB7664 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Small Business Act to include requirements relating to graduates of career and technical education programs or programs of study for small business development centers and women’s business centers, and for other purposes.
Title
Supporting Small Business and Career and Technical Education Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 399 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2022-06-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 18 (Roll no. 250). (text: 06/07/2022 CR H5255) |
2022-06-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5399-5400) |
2022-06-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7664. |
2022-06-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5255-5256) |
2022-06-07 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 117-330. |
2022-05-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3366 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7628 (Related) 2022-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB4881 (Related) 2022-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB7628 (Related) 2022-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB4881 (Related) 2022-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.