US HB7632 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide access to reliable, clean, and drinkable water on Tribal lands, and for other purposes.
Title
Tribal Access to Clean Water Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] |
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2022-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2022-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2022-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2369 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7632/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7632/BILLS-117hr7632ih.pdf |