US HB7622 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Small Business Act to include requirements relating to apprenticeship program assistance for small business development centers, and for other purposes.
Title
Small Business Workforce Pipeline Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 368 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2022-06-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 368 - 52 (Roll no. 249). (text: 06/07/2022 CR H5253) |
2022-06-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5399) |
2022-06-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7622. |
2022-06-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5253-5255) |
2022-06-07 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 247. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 117-329. |
2022-05-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2022-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |