US HB762 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2019 This bill directs the Department of Energy's Office of Energy and Renewable Energy to establish a clearinghouse for disseminating information regarding available programs and financing mechanisms that may be used to help initiate, develop, and finance energy efficiency, distributed generation, and energy retrofitting projects for schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2019-03-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2328)
2019-03-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 762.
2019-03-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2328-2329)
2019-03-05HouseMr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback