US HB7615 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to enter into partnerships to develop housing, and for other purposes.
Title
LODGE Act Lodging Options Developed for Government Employees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 499. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-682. |
2022-12-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-12-08 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2022-06-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |