US HB7596 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to provide DOD medical providers with mandatory training with respect to the potential health effects of burn pits.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Defense to provide medical providers of the Department of Defense mandatory training with respect to the potential health effects of burn pits.
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2020-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB1790 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB1790 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Employment and training programs
Fires
Medical education
Military medicine
Solid waste and recycling
Employment and training programs
Fires
Medical education
Military medicine
Solid waste and recycling
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7596/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7596/BILLS-116hr7596ih.pdf |