US HB758 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Cooperate with Law Enforcement Agencies and Watch Act of 2019 This bill limits a financial institution's liability for maintaining a customer account or a customer transaction in compliance with a written request by a federal, state, tribal, or local law enforcement agency. A federal or state agency may not take an adverse supervisory action against a financial institution with respect to maintaining an account or a transaction consistent with such a request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cooperate with Law Enforcement Agencies and Watch Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 120 (Y: 404 N: 7 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2019-03-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 7 (Roll no. 120). (text: CR H2623)
2019-03-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2627)
2019-03-11HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-03-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 758.
2019-03-11HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2623-2625)
2019-03-11HouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1592 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback