US HB7565 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Seminole Tribe of Florida to lease, sell, convey, warrant, or transfer its real property that is not held in trust by the United States.
Title
To authorize the Seminole Tribe of Florida to lease or transfer certain land, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-08-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2020-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4079 (Same As) 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7565/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7565/BILLS-116hr7565ih.pdf |