US HB754 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To establish an advisory commission regarding eligibility for health care furnished by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modernizing Veterans’ Health Care Eligibility Act

Sponsors

Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2023-03-29HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2023-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2023-02-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2023-02-02HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback