US HB7522 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To encourage the establishment in the Department of State of an Office of Global Criminal Justice, and for other purposes.
Title
Global Criminal Justice Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] |
Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1157 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
HB8788 (Related) 2022-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
HB8788 (Related) 2022-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7522/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7522/BILLS-117hr7522ih.pdf |