US HB7500 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-190.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-190.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize major medical facility projects for the Department of Veterans Affairs for fiscal year 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Fiscal Year 2022 Veterans Affairs Major Medical Facility Authorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 402 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-10 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-190. |
2022-10-10 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-10-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4625) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2022-05-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 2 (Roll no. 201). (text: 05/16/2022 CR H4996) |
2022-05-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5081-5082) |
2022-05-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7500. |
2022-05-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4996-4997) |
2022-05-16 | House | Mr. Trone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2624 (Same As) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.