US HB7496 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires federal agencies to submit to Congress plans for responding to any resurgence of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Specifically, each agency shall submit (1) an initial report detailing an action plan, informed by research and best practices learned from the onset of COVID-19 and previous presidentially declared emergencies, for addressing the needs and mitigating and eliminating the risks and challenges associated with any resurgence in COVID-19 cases; and (2) subsequent reports, on a quarterly basis until the President ends the declared emergency, that update the details submitted in the plan. The initial report shall include agency priorities for preparing for and responding to any resurgence; measurable goals specific to priorities and a time line for addressing each priority; anticipated challenges to addressing priorities and how the agency will address such challenges; how the agency will consult with Congress, the public, state and municipal governments, and relevant stakeholders while working remotely; and how the agency plans to issue relevant guidance to entities under the jurisdiction of the agency.
Title
COVID PREPARE Act of 2020 COVID Preparedness, Response, and Effective Planning for Advanced Requirements by the Executive Branch Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5075) |
2020-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7496. |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5075-5077) |
2020-09-30 | House | Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3620) |
2020-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government operations and politics
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Performance measurement
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government operations and politics
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Performance measurement
State and local government operations