US HB7457 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To hold the Chinese Communist Party accountable for the COVID-19 pandemic that has killed approximately 981,000 Americans.
Title
Hold CCP Accountable Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Rules, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-04-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB354 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1562 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Ways and Means, Armed Services, Education and Labor, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2622 (Related) 2021-04-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB3583 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB7193 (Related) 2022-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB570 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB590 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Held at the desk.
SB690 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB785 (Related) 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1987 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2587 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB1562 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Ways and Means, Armed Services, Education and Labor, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2622 (Related) 2021-04-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB3583 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB7193 (Related) 2022-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB570 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB590 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Held at the desk.
SB690 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB785 (Related) 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1987 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2587 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7457/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7457/BILLS-117hr7457ih.pdf |