US HB7457 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a national motor carrier safety selection standard for entities that contract with certain motor carriers to transport goods, and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Carrier Safety Selection Standard Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7248 (Related) 2020-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB8513 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB8513 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Subjects
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Motor carriers
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Life, casualty, property insurance
Motor carriers
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7457/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7457/BILLS-116hr7457ih.pdf |