US HB7440 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-149. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-149. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes sanctions on foreign individuals and entities that materially contribute to China's failure to preserve Hong Kong's autonomy. Hong Kong is part of China but has a largely separate legal and economic system with protections for civil rights such as freedom of speech. This arrangement is enshrined in (1) the Joint Declaration, a 1984 treaty pertaining to the United Kingdom's transfer of Hong Kong's sovereignty to China; and (2) the Basic Law, Hong Kong's constitutional document. The Department of State shall report annually to Congress information about (1) foreign individuals and entities that materially contributed to China's failure to comply with the Joint Declaration or the Basic Law; and (2) foreign financial institutions that knowingly conducted a significant transaction with such identified individuals and entities. An individual, entity, or financial institution may be excluded from this report for various reasons, such as to protect an intelligence source. The President shall impose property-blocking sanctions on an individual or entity named in a report, and visa-blocking sanctions on a named individual. The President shall impose various sanctions on a financial institution named in a report, such as prohibiting the institution from receiving loans from a U.S. financial institution. The President may waive or terminate the imposition of sanctions under this bill. Congress may override such a waiver or termination by passing a joint resolution of disapproval.
Title
Hong Kong Autonomy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-149. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-07-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2020-07-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4180) |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-07-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-01 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2020-07-01 | House | H.Amdt.831 On agreeing to the Sherman amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-01 | House | H.Amdt.831 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Sherman. (consideration: CR H3044; text: CR H3044) |
2020-07-01 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3039-3044; text: CR H3039-3044) |
2020-07-01 | House | Mr. Sherman asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-07-01 | House | Committee on Rules discharged. |
2020-07-01 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2020-07-01 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2020-07-01 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-07-01 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7083 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3798 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Held at the desk.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
SB3798 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Held at the desk.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Asia
Banking and financial institutions regulation
China
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Hong Kong
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Legislative rules and procedure
News media and reporting
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Banking and financial institutions regulation
China
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Hong Kong
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Legislative rules and procedure
News media and reporting
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers