US HB7403 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to carry out a program to operate a uranium reserve consisting of uranium produced and converted in the United States and a program to ensure the availability of uranium produced, converted, and enriched in the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
NO RUSSIA Act of 2022 National Opportunity to Restore Uranium Supply Services In America Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3978 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
HB8981 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB8981 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7403/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7403/BILLS-117hr7403ih.pdf |