US HB7399 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Land Between the Lakes Protection Act of 1998 to clarify the administration of the Land Between the Lakes National Recreation Area, and for other purposes.
Title
LBL Recreation and Heritage Act Land Between the Lakes Recreation and Heritage Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-04-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3997 (Same As) 2022-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7399/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7399/BILLS-117hr7399ih.pdf |