US HB737 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 147-51-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Shark Fin Sales Elimination Act of 2019 This bill makes it illegal to possess, buy, or sell shark fins or any product containing shark fins, except for certain dogfish fins. A person may possess a shark fin that was lawfully taken consistent with a license or permit under certain circumstances. Penalties are imposed for violations under the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shark Fin Sales Elimination Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-01-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB614 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB877 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback