US HB7352 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-166.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-166.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Small Business Act to extend the statute of limitation for fraud by borrowers under the Paycheck Protection Program, and for other purposes.
Title
PPP and Bank Fraud Enforcement Harmonization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 421 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-166. |
2022-08-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-08-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3790) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2022-06-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 246). (text: 06/07/2022 CR H5249) |
2022-06-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5396-5397) |
2022-06-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7352. |
2022-06-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5249-5250) |
2022-06-07 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 117-328. |
2022-05-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2022-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |