US HB733 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Department of Agriculture to transfer to the administrative jurisdiction of the Department of the Interior all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to approximately 11,760 acres of identified federal land in the Chippewa National Forest in Cass County, Minnesota. Immediately upon transfer, the federal land shall be held in trust for the benefit of the Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe and considered as a part of its reservation. The federal land shall not become eligible or be used for gaming activities under the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe Reservation Restoration Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 549.
2020-12-18HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-665.
2020-09-30HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-09-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-09-30HouseSubcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
2020-09-30HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2019-06-05HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-01-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB199 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-255.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback