US HB7318 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Assets Sale and Transfer Act of 2016 to ensure that the Public Buildings Reform Board has adequate time to carry out the responsibilities of the Board, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Federal Assets Sale and Transfer Act of 2016 to remove the deadline for appointment of members to the Public Buildings Reform Board and revise the board's termination date to six years after its members have been selected for appointment pursuant to the Act.
Title
To amend the Federal Assets Sale and Transfer Act of 2016 to ensure that the Public Buildings Reform Board has adequate time to carry out the responsibilities of the Board, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 475 (Y: 372 N: 2 NV: 58 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8034) |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 372 - 2 (Roll no. 475). (text: CR H10514) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10532-10533) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7318. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10514-10515) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. Mast moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-12-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-12-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3675 (Same As) 2018-11-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Advisory bodies
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Advisory bodies
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations