US HB7316 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for the establishment or operation of a center to be known as the Emergency Mental Health and Substance Use Training and Technical Assistance Center.
Title
To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for the establishment or operation of a center to be known as the Emergency Mental Health and Substance Use Training and Technical Assistance Center.
Sponsors
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB4093 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB4093 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Disability assistance
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical education
Mental health
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical education
Mental health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7316/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7316/BILLS-116hr7316ih.pdf |