US HB7314 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of State to submit to Congress a report on the People's Republic of China's support to the Russian Federation with respect to its unprovoked invasion of and full-scale war against Ukraine, and for other purposes.
Title
AXIS Act Assessing Xi’s Interference and Subversion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 394 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 3 (Roll no. 127). (text: CR H4525) |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4552-4553) |
2022-04-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-04-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7314. |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4525-4527) |
2022-04-27 | House | Mr. Phillips moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-04-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.