US HB7289 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Director of the Defense Logistics Agency to carry out a pilot program for temporary issuance of maternity-related uniform items to pregnant members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.
Title
Rent the Camo: Access to Maternity Wear Act
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2020-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB8099 (Related) 2020-08-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
SB4660 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8099 (Related) 2020-08-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
SB4660 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7289/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7289/BILLS-116hr7289ih.pdf |