US HB7287 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the licensure requirements for contractor medical professionals to perform medical disability examinations for the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
To clarify the licensure requirements for contractor medical professionals to perform medical disability examinations for the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2020-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4365 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Veterans' medical care
Disability and paralysis
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7287/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7287/BILLS-116hr7287ih.pdf |