US HB7277 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the methods by which the Secretary of Veterans Affairs identifies health care providers that are not eligible to participate in the Veterans Community Care Program.
Title
Improving Oversight of Veterans Community Care Providers Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-11-17 | House | Pursuant to section 2 of H. Res. 1464, and the motion offered by Mr. Carter (LA), the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4275, as amended; H.R. 5502, as amended; H.R. 5721, as amended; H.R. 6290, as amended; H.R. 7277, as amended; H.R. 7299, as amended; and H.R. 8416, as amended. (consideration: CR H8566-8574; text: CR H8569) |
2022-11-17 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1464, proceedings on H.R. 7277 are considered vacated. |
2022-11-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7277. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8465-8467; text: CR H8465-8566) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1464 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.