US HB7264 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make supplemental appropriations for the Departments of Agriculture, the Interior, Homeland Security, Labor, and Commerce for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes.
Title
21st Century Conservation Corps for Our Health and Our Jobs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7273 (Related) 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB3684 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB3684 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
Appropriations
Aquatic ecology
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Labor
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Fishes
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
National and community service
Natural disasters
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Sports and recreation facilities
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Worker safety and health
Youth employment and child labor
Aquatic ecology
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Labor
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Fishes
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
National and community service
Natural disasters
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Sports and recreation facilities
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Worker safety and health
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7264/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7264/BILLS-116hr7264ih.pdf |