US HB7259 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Patents for Humanity Program Improvement Act This bill authorizes the holder of an acceleration certificate awarded under the Patents for Humanity program to transfer the certificate to another party. (The Patents for Humanity program recognizes patent owners, applicants, and licensees that use their inventions to meet humanitarian challenges. The winners each receive a certificate which can be used to accelerate certain U.S. Patent and Trademark Office proceedings, such as a patent application.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patents for Humanity Program Improvement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
2020-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2020-06-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-06-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2503)
2020-06-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7259.
2020-06-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2503-2504)
2020-06-25HouseMr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-06-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2020-06-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2814 (Same As) 2019-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback