US HB7236 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-5)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to expand the availability of mental, emotional, and behavioral health services under the Medicaid program, and for other purposes.
Title
Strengthen Kids’ Mental Health Now Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4498 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4747 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4747 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7236/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7236/BILLS-117hr7236ih.pdf |