US HB7234 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize certain programs with respect to mental health conditions and substance use disorders, and for other purposes.
Title
Summer Barrow Prevention, Treatment, and Recovery Act
Sponsors
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7105 (Related) 2022-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7666 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1191 (Similar To) 2022-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7666 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1191 (Similar To) 2022-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7234/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7234/BILLS-117hr7234ih.pdf |