US HB7188 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to conduct a national, evidence-based education campaign to increase public and health care provider awareness regarding the potential risks and benefits of human cell and tissue products transplants, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shandra Eisenga Human Cell and Tissue Product Safety Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate.
2024-12-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-12-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7167-7168)
2024-12-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7188.
2024-12-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7167-7170)
2024-12-16HouseMr. Bucshon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2024-11-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 632.
2024-11-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-766.
2024-09-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 0.
2024-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-05-16HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 0.
2024-05-16HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-02-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2024-02-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2024-02-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3733 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback