US HB716 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Interior to convey, without consideration, to the city of Vancouver, Washington, the Pearson Aviation Museum complex, including the main and historic hangars, headquarters, and munitions buildings, and the approximately seven acre complex site. Requires the city to pay the costs of such conveyance.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain Federal land to the city of Vancouver, Washington, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 14. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-20 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-03-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/716/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr716/BILLS-113hr716ih.pdf |