US HB7155 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the importation of petroleum and petroleum products from the Russian Federation, to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to establish an income tax credit for the sale or blending of certain fuels containing ethanol and to extend tax incentives for biodiesel and renewable diesel, to amend the Clean Air Act with respect to the ethanol waiver for Reid vapor pressure limitations under that Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Home Front Energy Independence Act
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3787 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2271 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB2271 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7155/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7155/BILLS-117hr7155ih.pdf |