US HB7146 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the relief of Victoria Galindo Lopez.
Title
For the relief of Victoria Galindo Lopez.
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H7002-7003) |
2020-12-08 | House | H.Amdt.907 On agreeing to the Bass amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | H.Amdt.907 Amendment (A001) offered by Ms. Bass. (consideration: CR H7002-7003; text: CR H7002-7003) |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7002-7003; text: CR H7002) |
2020-12-08 | House | Ms. Bass asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-11-18 | House | Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 4. |
2020-11-18 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-597. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |