US HB7119 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Health and Human Services to convey specified property in Anchorage, Alaska, to the Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium for use in connection with health programs. Such conveyance shall not require any consideration from, or impose any obligation, term, or condition on, the consortium or allow for any U.S. reversionary interest in the property. The consortium shall not be liable for any environmental contamination that occurred on or before the date on which the consortium assumes control of, occupies, and uses the property.
Title
Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium Land Transfer Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516. |
2020-12-08 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-12-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-631, Part I. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-29 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2020-07-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3100 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Native Americans
Pollution liability
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Native Americans
Pollution liability