US HB7108 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-110.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-110.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To suspend normal trade relations treatment for the Russian Federation and the Republic of Belarus, and for other purposes.
Title
Suspending Normal Trade Relations with Russia and Belarus Act
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Victoria Spartz [R-IN] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with an amendment (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment (Y: 420 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 424 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment (Y: 420 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 424 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-110. |
2022-04-08 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-07 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 3 (Roll no. 124). (text: CR H4415-4416) |
2022-04-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-04-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 7108. |
2022-04-07 | House | Mr. Neal moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H4415-4417, H4419-4420) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.5020 Amendment SA 5020 proposed by Senator Schumer. (consideration: CR S5020; text: 04/06/2022 CR S2048-2049) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.5020 Amendment SA 5020 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-04-07 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-04-07 | House | Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 3 (Roll no. 124). (text: CR H4415-4416) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 131. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: 04/06/2022 CR S2048-2049) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2060) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 313. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 8 (Roll no. 78). (text: CR H3802-3804) |
2022-03-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7108. |
2022-03-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3802-3810) |
2022-03-17 | House | Mr. Neal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7014 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3786 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3786 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.