US HB7098 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the boundary of Saguaro National Park in Arizona by adding approximately 1,232 acres to the park, and it requires the Department of the Interior to conduct a study to identify lands outside the boundaries of the park that may be appropriate for inclusion in the park. The study must be conducted in accordance with criteria of the National Park Service (NPS) for boundary adjustment studies. Interior may, with the consent of Arizona and in accordance with federal and state law, acquire land or interests therein owned by the state within the boundary of the park. If Interior is unable to acquire such state land, Interior may enter into an agreement that would allow the NPS to manage such land within the park's boundary.
Title
Saguaro National Park Boundary Expansion and Study Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7124) |
2020-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7098. |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7124-7125) |
2020-12-10 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-12-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 504. |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-612. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arizona
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources