US HB7092 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 164-24-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Great American Outdoors Act This bill establishes the National Parks and Public Land Legacy Restoration Fund to support deferred maintenance projects on federal lands. For FY2021-FY2025, there shall be deposited into the fund an amount equal to 50% of all federal revenues from the development of oil, gas, coal, or alternative or renewable energy on federal lands and waters. Deposited amounts must not exceed $1.9 billion for any fiscal year. The fund must be used for priority deferred maintenance projects in specified systems that are administered by the National Park Service, the Forest Service, the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, the Bureau of Land Management, and the Bureau of Indian Education. The Government Accountability Office must report on the effect of the fund in reducing the backlog of priority deferred maintenance projects for the specified agencies. Additionally, the bill makes funding for the Land and Water Conservation Fund (LWCF) permanent. The President shall annually report to Congress specified details regarding the allocation of funds to the LWCF. Congress may provide for alternate allocations using specified procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Great American Outdoors Act

Sponsors

Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1957 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB3195 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222.
SB1081 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429.
SB3422 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 438.
SB3684 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback