US HB7090 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $36 billion for a Coronavirus County Relief Fund to make payments to counties to compensate for revenue lost and costs incurred as a result of the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency. Specifically, a county shall use the funds to compensate for direct loss of revenue due to the public health emergency or to cover its costs that are necessary expenditures incurred due to the public health emergency, were not accounted for in the budget most recently approved as of February 29, 2020, and were incurred from March 1, 2020-December 30, 2020. Each county shall receive a flat payment plus an amount based on its population. The bill provides funding for the Office of Inspector General of the Department of the Treasury to conduct monitoring and oversight of the receipt, disbursement, and use of such funds. The bill reauthorizes the payments in lieu of taxes program, which compensates local governments for tax revenue lost due to tax-exempt federal lands within their boundaries.
Title
Coronavirus County Relief and Stability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Department of the Treasury
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Property tax
State and local finance
State and local taxation
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Department of the Treasury
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Property tax
State and local finance
State and local taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7090/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7090/BILLS-116hr7090ih.pdf |