US HB7075 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-47)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate Ukrainian Independence Park in Washington, District of Columbia, and for other purposes.
Title
Ukrainian Independence Park Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437. |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-604. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2022-04-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |