US HB7073 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
50 Votes for the Wall Act This bill establishes the Border Wall and Security Trust Fund for funds appropriated to construct a wall (including physical barriers and associated detection technology, roads, and lighting) along the international border between the United States and Mexico by January 19, 2021. The bill provides appropriations to the fund equal to amounts requested by the Department of Homeland Security, which may not exceed a total of $25 billion. The authority provided by this bill terminates on September 30, 2028. When the authority expires, any unobligated balances in the fund must be returned to the Treasury.
Title
50 Votes for the Wall Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2018-10-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2018-10-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Immigration
Latin America
Mexico
New Mexico
Texas
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Immigration
Latin America
Mexico
New Mexico
Texas
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/7073/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr7073/BILLS-115hr7073ih.pdf |