US HB7068 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

VoteSafe Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VoteSafe Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. David Scott [D-GA]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
2020-06-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6807 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB3725 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB3822 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback