US HB7060 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To modify conditions of funding for the distance learning, telemedicine, and broadband program of the Rural Utilities Service, and for other purposes.
Title
Connect Unserved Americans Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] | Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3587 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text: CR S547)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7060/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7060/BILLS-117hr7060ih.pdf |